Husain, Mansoor (CPSO#: 57388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology 1NU-119
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3188
Fax: (416) 340-4021
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St., Suite 5 East
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5658
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MyHealth Centre - MediScan Diagnost
2575 Danforth Ave, Unit 8
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Canada
Phone: 416-690-9437
Fax: 416-690-9441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MyHealth Centre - MediScan
294 Main St, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Canada
Phone: 416-690-9437
Fax: 416-690-9441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MyHealth Centre - Tulip
229 Broadway #1
Orangeville ON  L9W1K4
Canada
Phone: (519) 943-0022
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Husain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Husain ( CPSO# 58439 )
Dr. M. Husain ( CPSO# 57388 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
1NU-119 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3188

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
5-403 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-4800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
MyHealth Centre
229 Broadway
Unit 1
Orangeville ON  L9W 1K4
Phone Number: (519) 943-0022

Business Address:
201 - 294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 901-2088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANSOOR HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1987