Husain, Mohammad Husain Ebrahim (CPSO#: 69577)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Aug 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 03 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 02 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Aug 1999 to 03 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2000