Husain, Shahid (CPSO#: 88255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Apr 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Suite PMB 11 - 138
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3144
Fax: (416) 340-5442
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahid Husain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Husain ( CPSO# 88255 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite PMB-11-138
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 25 Apr 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shahid Husain may practise medicine independently in Infectious Diseases.