Husain, Siraj Mohammed (CPSO#: 63541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tom Baker Cancer Center
1331-29 Street North West
Calgary AB  T2N 4N2
Phone: (403) 521-3164
Fax: (403) 283-1651

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIRAJ MOHAMMED HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991