Huschiltt, Peter Nikolaus (CPSO#: 18552)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2011

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: April 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Peter Nikolaus Huschiltt, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Peter Nikolaus Huschiltt:

(2)Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of professional
misconduct to the Discipline Committee by way of a Notice of Hearing dated January 12, 2010.
(4) Hereby resign from the College effective April 15, 2011 (the “Effective Date”).
(5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for a certificate of registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,
(12) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.