Huseynova, Khumar (CPSO#: 83426)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Russian

Education:The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014