Husni, Mariwan Hassan (CPSO#: 67320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Kurdi

Education:University of Mosul, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional H S C
Department of Psychiatry
980 Oliver Road, Room 3049
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6029
Fax: (807) 684-5893
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIWAN HASSAN HUSNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSNI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011