Hussain, Balal (CPSO#: 102274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Marais Medical Centre
2930 Dominion Blvd.
Windsor ON  N9E 2M8
Phone: (226) 773-8441
Fax: (226) 773-3410
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Medical Centre
130 Ouellette Place
Unit 3
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Fax: (519) 971-2902
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balal Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hussain ( CPSO# 102274)

Business Address:
Grand Marais Medical Centre
2930 Dominion Boulevard
Windsor ON  N9E 2M8
Phone Number: (226) 773-8441

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Centre
Suite 3
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 971-2901

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Oct 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Balal Hussain may practise medicine independently in family medicine.