Hussain, Farida Khatoon (CPSO#: 32825)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013