Hussain, Kamal Sharif (CPSO#: 80365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,
Bayview Campus
Dept. of Anesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87757
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, M5 318
Toronto. On.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87757
Fax: (416) 480-5614
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamal Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hussain ( CPSO# 80365 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre - Bayview Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M5-318
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL SHARIF HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 12 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010