Hussain, Majid (CPSO#: 107859)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2015 to 28 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2015