Hussain, Maria (CPSO#: 86742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
P.O. Box 603
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 5444900
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-2473
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussain ( CPSO# 86742 )

Business Address:
Providence Care
Division of Geriatric Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2013