Hussain, Mohammed Taqiuddin (CPSO#: 77936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1400 Windsor Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3L9
Phone: (519) 971-0116
Fax: (519) 252-5646
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED TAQIUDDIN HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004