Hussain, Nusrat (CPSO#: 83132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar MemorialHospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571 Ext. 6489
Fax: (905) 845-3376
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nusrat Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hussain ( CPSO# 83132 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 26 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NUSRAT HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010