Hussain, Saba (CPSO#: 99735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Dec 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Health Center
16-2555 Erin Centre Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone: (905) 828-0270
Fax: 905-828-0277
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Glenashton Medical Clinic
unit 2
333 Glenashton Drive
Oakville ON  L6H 7P6
Canada
Phone: 905-582-4929
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussain ( CPSO# 99735 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Health Center
16-2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone Number: (905) 828-0270

Business Address:
333 Glenashton Drive
Suite 2
Oakville ON  L6H 7P6
Phone Number: (905) 582-4929

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Dec 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Saba Hussain may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.