Hussain, Tasneem (CPSO#: 78200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MI CLINIC
UNIT E229 A /PO BOX M
5100 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5M 4Z5
Phone: (905) 607-2600
Fax: (905) 607-1702
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hussain ( CPSO# 78200 )

Business Address:
Suite A005A & A006A
2690 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5P5
Phone Number: (905) 607-1700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TASNEEM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004