Hussain, Zafar (CPSO#: 32725)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Urdu

Education:Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014