Hussaini, Syed Muzafarullah (CPSO#: 50810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 179
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 977-6768
Fax: (519) 977-7690
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hussaini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussaini ( CPSO# 50810 )

Business Address:
179 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 977-6768

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED MUZAFARULLAH HUSSAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAINI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009