Hussein, Albador Hamza A (CPSO#: 78810)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jan 2003 to 19 Feb 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 21 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 2005