Hussein, Mohammad Hasan Soliman (CPSO#: 88287)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 20 May 2008 to 11 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 12 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 May 2010