Hussein, Mohammed Hammodi (CPSO#: 82315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

39 Commerce Road
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3
Canada
Phone: 7053208080
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussein ( CPSO# 82315 )

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-2613

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HAMMODI HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Sep 2013
Summary:

 On September 23, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mohammed Hussein committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all those circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
 by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hussein admitted the allegation. 
 

Dr. Hussein provided incorrect, untrue and inaccurate information in his application for a 
 certificate of registration with the College, and in his application for a provisional licence 
 with the Newfoundland Medical Board, in the following respects:
(a)	He was not in continuous 
 practice between 1995 and 2000; 
(b)	He was not practising medicine in Iraq between 1995 and 2000; 
 
(c)	He declared that the answers he gave to the questions in the applications were true, complete 
 and without the intent to mislead.

In his application to the College, he also failed to disclose 
 that he discontinued his medical practice for over one year.

The Committee ordered and directed 
 that:
(	the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hussein's 
 certificate of registration:
(a)	Dr. Hussein shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the 
 College's individualized instruction in professionalism and medical ethics on the next available 
 date, and provide proof thereof to the College.
(	Dr. Hussein appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.
(	Dr. Hussein pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 within 30 days of 
 the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 23, 2013