Hussein, Sundus Abbas Bandor (CPSO#: 75977)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 26 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 11 Apr 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 12 Apr 2002 to 11 Apr 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 12 Apr 2003 to 11 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 12 Apr 2004 to 11 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 12 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006