Huszar, Leslie Anthony (CPSO#: 33740)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Huszar, Ladislaus Antonius (used until: 06 May 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993