Hutchings, Leslie-Anne (CPSO#: 70203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stayner Medical and Dental Clinic
Box 220
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 428-3246
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Hutchings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hutchings ( CPSO# 70203 )

Business Address:
Stayner Medical and Dental Clinic
7477 Highway 26
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 428-3246

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE-ANNE HUTCHINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINGS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998