Hutchings, Robyn Jenifer (CPSO#: 88206)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2008 to 25 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 30 Jun 2011 to 26 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2011