Hutchinson, Lisa Gaye (CPSO#: 58424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Lake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 830-5972
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA GAYE HUTCHINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988