Hutchinson, Neil Thomas (CPSO#: 31576)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil T. Hutchinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017