Hutchinson, Vivien (CPSO#: 27002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1974

Summary

Former Name: Hutchinson, Vivien Bessie (used until: 11 Jun 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Care Health Centre
Unit B
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 3L5
Phone: (705) 879-4100
Fax: (705) 324-8411
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivien Hutchinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Hutchinson ( CPSO# 27002 )

Business Address:
Community Care Health Centre
City of Kawartha Lakes
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 3L5
Phone Number: (705) 879-4100

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIEN HUTCHINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1974