Hutchison, James Sanders (CPSO#: 54784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Critical Care
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-4919
Fax: 416-813-7299
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James S. Hutchison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hutchison ( CPSO# 54784 )

Business Address:
Department of Critical Care
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES SANDERS HUTCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2011