Hutchison, Robert John (CPSO#: 27525)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Hutchison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 48 Price Avenue Hamilton ON L9C 1K3
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017