Hutchison, Rosemary Patricia (CPSO#: 27947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 469-9922
Fax: (416) 469-5536
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSEMARY PATRICIA HUTCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHISON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1982