Hutfluss, Richard Michael (CPSO#: 52758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutfluss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hutfluss ( CPSO# 52758 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD MICHAEL HUTFLUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTFLUSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988