Hutten-Czapski, Benjamin Sinclair (CPSO#: 110788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SINCLAIR HUTTEN-CZAPSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTEN-CZAPSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 19 Sep 2016 to 02 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Oct 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2017