Hutton, Robert Frank (CPSO#: 58076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kawartha Dental Clinic
250 Reid Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 3R1
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-1851
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutton and Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Scott ( CPSO# 58723 )
Dr. R. Hutton ( CPSO# 58076 )

Business Address:
250 Reid Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 3R1
Phone Number: (705) 743-1851

Business Address:
Peterbrough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT FRANK HUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1987