Hutton, Shannon Kimberly (CPSO#: 76150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downey Family Medical Centre
Unit 2
115 Downey Road
Guelph ON  N1C 1A2
Phone: (519) 827-9779
Fax: (519) 827-0162
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. K. Hutton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hutton ( CPSO# 76150 )

Business Address:
Downey Family Medical Centre
115 Downey Road
Unit 2
Guelph ON  N1C 1A2
Phone Number: (519) 827-9779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON KIMBERLY HUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003