Huynh, Chau Cong (CPSO#: 71729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4176
Fax: (416) 480-6770
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3175 Rutherford
Unit 67 Building L
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-6082
Fax: (905) 761-2144
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAU CONG HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2000