Huynh, Jody (CPSO#: 110829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  04 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164461575
Fax: 4164462919
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jody  Huynh  may  practise  paediatrics  at  520  Ellesmere Road, in
                  Scarborough, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Huynh's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does  not  provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Huynh's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report,  pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Huynh's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 5, 2016,  and  will  expire on or
                  before March 4, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.