Huynh, Lise Jennifer (CPSO#: 98169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Palliative Medicine
H Wing 3rd Floor - Room H351
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89654
Fax: 416-480-5146
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lise Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Huynh ( CPSO# 98169 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Palliative Medicine
3rd Floor H Wing-Room H351
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
604 - 1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 485-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISE JENNIFER HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014