Huynh, Thien Jason (CPSO#: 90813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THIEN JASON HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017