Huynh, Xinh (CPSO#: 68069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 14-B
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone: (905) 567-4622
Fax: (905) 567-7545
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xinh Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Huynh ( CPSO# 68069 )

Business Address:
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 14-B
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone Number: (905) 567-4622

Business Address:
1011 Upper Middle Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 849-7007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XINH HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996