Hwa, Granger Guo Chiang (CPSO#: 70360)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 17 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Apr 2000