Hwang, Angela (CPSO#: 51661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The Middlesex Hospital Medical School, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 261-7223
Fax: (416) 261-6374
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hwang ( CPSO# 51661 )

Business Address:
403 - 520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 261-7223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1984