Hwang, Joshua (CPSO#: 111009)

Current Status: Suspended as of 16 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 18 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 1, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 12, 2017, London Health Sciences Centre notified the College that Dr. Joshua Hwang's Privileges were suspended, effective September 1, 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 16 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 16 Aug 2017


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2017 Active

Concerns

Source: Legal Department
Active Date: August 10, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CRIMINAL CHARGES:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.
The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Joshua Hwang, on or about June 21, 2017 at the City of Ottawa, did, without lawful excuse, surreptitiously make a visual recording of a person who was in circumstances that gave rise to a reasonable expectation of privacy when that person was in a place in which that person could reasonably be expected to be nude, to be exposing his or her genital organs or anal region or exposing her breasts or be engaged in explicit sexual activity, namely the victim’s bathroom, and thereby commit an offence under Section 162(1a) of the Criminal Code of Canada, contrary to Section 162(5) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: August 4, 2017
Place of charges: Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Police Service