Hwang, Mei Lump-Mee (CPSO#: 61395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 261-7223
Fax: (416) 261-6374
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEI LUMP-MEE HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)