Hyde, Byron Marshall (CPSO#: 21364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
121 Iona Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 3M1
Phone: (613) 722-5555
Fax: (613) 729-0148
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BYRON MARSHALL HYDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2014