Hyland, Robert Hylton (CPSO#: 27161)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michael's Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018