Hynd, Jamie William Harold (CPSO#: 52644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
7748 Kent Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 7J9
Phone: (613) 345-1236
Fax: (613) 345-4285
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE WILLIAM HAROLD HYND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988