Hynes, David Michael (CPSO#: 41335)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M Hynes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 May 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Michael Hynes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective May 23, 2016:

Dr. Hynes may not engage in and/or perform mammography and breast ultrasound.