Hynes, Mark Stephen (CPSO#: 62015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Cardiac Anaesthesia
Room H2410
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7381
Fax: (613) 696-7099
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. S. Hynes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hynes ( CPSO# 62015 )

Business Address:
Department of Cardiac Anaesthesia
Ottawa Heart Institute
H2410 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK STEPHEN HYNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYNES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 1994 to 28 Feb 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1996 to 30 Apr 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1996