Hynes, Nicolas Marcus (CPSO#: 63669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lotus Cosmetic Surgery Centre
and Medispa
199 MacNab Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3C8
Phone: (905) 645-5640
Fax: (905) 645-5643
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLAS MARCUS HYNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYNES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992